+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- H adopted
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Utilities
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Utilities
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Utilities
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Utilities
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- S adopted
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Offered--SCR 5-Wallingford
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor