+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on General Laws
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on General Laws
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- S adopted
On April 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On March 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor