+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H General Laws
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H General Laws
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed, as amended
- SA 1 S offered & adopted (Curls)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SCR 4-Curls, et al
+ − Amendment
1387S01.01S
SA 1 S offered & adopted (Curls)