+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Signed by Senate President
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Agri-Business Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Referred H Agri-Business Committee
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- H First Read
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Stouffer)--(4145S02.01S)
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor w/SCS
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SCRs 35 & 32) S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (4145S.02C)
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SCR 35-Stouffer, et al
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor