+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- H adopted
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the House
- S adopted
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Offered
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor