+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Adopted
- H adopted
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
On April 13, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Health Care Policy Committee
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Health Care Policy Committee
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- S adopted
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor