+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy
- Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Referred H Agriculture Policy
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor