+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- H adopted
On March 14, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred H Rules Committee
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- S adopted, as amended
- SA 1 S offered & adopted (Crowell)--(1435L01.01F)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee to Floor
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- S offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor