+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SS S offered & adopted (Crowell)--(0079S.02F)
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SJR 3-Crowell
On December 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor