+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Inf Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee to Floor
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs and Elections Committee
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs and Elections Committee
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organization, Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor