+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 25-Cunningham, with SCS (pending)
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to adopt SCS S withdrawn
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Corrected Committee Report to reflection the adoption of SCS
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (2386S.05C)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- S Offered--SCR 25-Cunningham
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor