+ − Actions (22)
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Sub-Motion to refuse to concur & Request H recede or conference - Adopted
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur in HCS
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS H adopted
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Resolutions Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Resolutions Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Resolutions Committee
- Referred H Rules Committee
- H Second Read
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- SA 1 S withdrawn
- SS S offered & adopted (Schneider) (1112S.05)
- SA 2 S offered & adopted (Schneider)
- S Third Read and Passed
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- SA 1 S offered (Schneider)
- Taken up for Third Reading
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Taken up for Third Reading - Motion withdrawn
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor