+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass - FAILED - H Downsizing State Government Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government Committee
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred H Downsizing State Government Committee
On April 22, 2011 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Hearing Cancelled S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Perfected
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee to Floor
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee
On January 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SJR 10-Lembke and Green
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor