+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H General Laws
- Voted Do Pass H General Laws
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- S adopted
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Offered--SCR 1-Walsh
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor