+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 12-Onder, with SCS (pending)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 2 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Holsman)--(0816S05.03S)
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0816S05.02S)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0816S.05C)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SJR 12-Onder
+ − Amendments (2)
0816S05.03S
Withdrawn
0816S05.02S
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Onder
Type:
Primary Sponsor