+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2002 in the House:
- H adopted & Third Read
On May 15, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Miscellaneous Bills Committee
On May 14, 2002 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Miscellaneous Bills Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Miscellaneous Bills Committee
On May 13, 2002 in the House:
- Referred H Miscellaneous Bills Committee
- H Second Read
On May 10, 2002 in the House:
- H First Read
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- S adopted
On May 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On April 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor