+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Adopted
- H adopted
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Naural Resources Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Conservation & Natural Resources Committee
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Conservation & Natural Resources Committee
- H First Read
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- S adopted
- SCS S adopted
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee to Floor w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee (4711S.02C)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor