+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 14, 2010 in the House:
- Referred H Insurance Policy Committee
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the House
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCR, as amended, S adopted
- SSA 1 for SA 1 S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(4408S01.03S)
- SA 1 S offered (Callahan)--(4408S01.02S)
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Offered--SCR 37-Schmitt
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor