+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- H Calendar S Concurrent Resolutions
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14)
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14)
- Reported Do Pass H Energy and the Environment
- Voted Do Pass H Energy and the Environment
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Energy and the Environment
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Energy and the Environment
- H Second Read
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the House
- S adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- S offered--SCR 36-Schmitt
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor