+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- H adopted
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy Committee
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Insurance Policy Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the House
- S adopted
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Offered
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor