+ − Actions (17)
On May 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Concurred in HCS, as amended
- S adopted
On May 10, 2001 in the House:
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (O'Toole)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
On May 3, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Environment & Energy Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Environment & Energy Committee
On April 19, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Hearing H Environment & Energy Committee
On April 17, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Environment & Energy Committee
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- SA 1 S offered & adopted (Dougherty)
- S adopted, as amended
On April 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Reported From S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee to Floor
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor