+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor