+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2001 in the House:
- H adopted
On May 2, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Commerce & Ecnomic Development Committee
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Commerce Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Commerce & Economic Development Committee
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Commerce Committee
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- S adopted
On March 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Reported From S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, Ethics Committee to Floor
On March 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On March 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor