+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- H adopted
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues Committee
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Emerging Issues Committee
- H Second Read
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the House
- S adopted
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- S offered--SCR 17-Hegeman
+ − Sponsors (2)
Hegeman
Type:
Primary Sponsor