+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- H adopted
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the House
- S adopted
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Offered
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor