+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred H Veterans Committee
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the House
- S Adopted
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- S Offered--SCR 16-Pearce
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor