+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee
On May 5, 2010 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy Committee
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Referred H Insurance Policy Committee
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Perfected
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Removed S Consent Calendar
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (Consent)
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 985-Goodman
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor