+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism and Local Government Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism and Local Government Committee
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled, Not Heard S Economic Development, Tourism Local Government Committee
On January 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism and Local Government Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor