+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (66)
On July 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 17, 2002 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- CCR/CCS H offered & adopted
- S Third Read and Passed
- CCR/CCS S offered & adopted
On May 16, 2002 in the House:
- (Smith, Hosmer, Britt, Mayer, Hendrickson)
- H conferees appointed
On May 15, 2002 in the House:
- H refused to recede & granted conference
On May 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- (Westfall, Bentley, Klindt, Caskey, Coleman)
- S conferees appointed
On May 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- S requested H recede or grant conference
- S refused to concur in HS#2 for HCS
On May 14, 2002 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- HS#2 for HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 3 to HS#2 for HCS H offered & defeated (Hosmer)
- HA 2 to HS#2 for HCS H offered & adopted (Reid)
- HA 1 to HS#2 for HCS H offered & adopted (Reid)
- HS#2 for HCS H offered (Smith) (3889L.17F)
On May 6, 2002 in the House:
- HA 4 to HS for HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Burton)
- HS for HCS H offered (Smith) (3880L.11F)
- HA 1 to HS for HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Reid)
- HA 1 to HS for HCS H offered & adopted(Hollingsworth)
- HA 2 to HS for HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Luetkenhaus)
- HA 3 to HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Hosmer)
- HA 2 to HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Wright)
- HA 4 to HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Johnson-90)
- HA 5 to HS for HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Jolly)
- HA 5 to HS for HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Reid)
- HA 5 to HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Crowell)
- HA 6 to HS for HCS H offered & withdrawn (Bartle)
- HA 6 to HS for HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Wright)
- HS for HCS, as amended, H defeated
- Bill Placed back on Calendar
On April 30, 2002 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Civil & Administrative Law Committee
On April 24, 2002 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Civil & Administrative Law Committee
- Hearing Continued H Civil & Administrative Law Committee
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Civil & Administrative Law Committee
On April 11, 2002 in the House:
- Referred H Civil & Administrative Law Committee
- H Second Read
On April 10, 2002 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On April 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Budget Control Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Budget Control
On April 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred S Budget Control Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Kinder)
- SSA 1 for SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Singleton)
- SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered (Klindt)
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Dougherty)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S withdrawn
- Perfected
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S offered (Westfall) (3880S.09F)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Dougherty)
- SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Childers)
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (SCS SBs 969, 673 & 855) S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3880S.06C)
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor