+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 96-Sater and Emery
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 96-Sater and Emery
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor