+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor (w/EC)
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Fiscal Review Committee
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Hearing Conducted
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(21)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Financial Institutions Committee
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Financial Institutions Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Financial Institutions Committee
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Financial Institutions Committee
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Purgason)--(4301S03.01S)
- SS for SCS S offered (Engler)--(4301S.03F)
- Perfected
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (4301S.02C)
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 944-Engler, et al
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor