+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- In Conference
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- H conferees appointed (Wilson, Hunter, Smith-118, George, Burnett)
- H refuses to recede & grants conference
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed (Loudon, Cauthorn, Bartle, Callahan, Quick)
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- S requests H recede or grant conference
- S refuses to concur in HS, as amended
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 6 to HS H adopted
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- HA 3 to HS H adopted
- Bill Placed back on Calendar
- Bill Placed back on Calendar
- HA 4 to HS H offered & adopted (St. Onge)
- HA 5 to HS H offered & adopted (Smith-118)
- HA 6 to HS H offered (Dempsey)
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- HS H offered (Wilson) (2073L.08F)
- HA 1 to HS H offered (Hunter)
- HSA 1 for HA 1 to HS H offered (Wilson)
- HSA 1 for HA 1 to HS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 1 to HS H offered & adopted (Morris)
- HA 2 to HS H offered & adopted (Hunter)
- HA 3 to HS H offered (Cooper)
- Bill Placed back on Calendar
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Small Business, Insurance & Industrial Relations Committee to Floor - Consent
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee-Consent
On January 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance & Industrial Relations Committee-Consent
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor