+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor