+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 920-Schmitt and Kraus
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 920-Schmitt and Kraus
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor