+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Bill Placed Back on Formal Calendar
- Bill placed on Informal Calendar
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Conducted H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Transportation
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Transportation
- Committee Vote Reconsidered
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected, as amended
- SA 1 S offered & adopted (Riddle)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 919-Libla
+ − Amendments (6)
5772S01.11H
Distributed
5772S01.09H
Distributed
5772S01.07H
Distributed
5772S01.05H
Distributed
5772S01.06H
Distributed
5772S01.01S
SA 1 S offered & adopted (Riddle)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor