+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS H defeated
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4)
- Reported Do Pass H Small Business w/HCA 1
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Small Business w/Amendments
- Hearing Conducted H Small Business
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Small Business
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Kehoe)
- SSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S adopted
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Dixon)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (5244S.04C)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 919-Schmitt
+ − Amendments (13)
5244H09.11H
Distributed
5244H09.09H
Distributed
5244S07.10H
Distributed
5244S07.11H
Distributed
5244H09.05H
Distributed
5244H09.08H
Distributed
5244H09.01H
Distributed
5244S07.04H
Committee
5244S07.05S
SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered (Kehoe)
5244S07.11S
SSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)
5244S07.08S
SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Dixon)
5244S07.01F
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Chappelle-Nadal)
5244S.07F
SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor