+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
- Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
- Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
- Referred to H Rules Committee
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws Committee
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 907-Richard
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor