+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Elections Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (6133S.02C)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 892-Kraus
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor