+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Public Safety Committee
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Public Safety Committee
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Public Safety Committee
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Referred H Public Safety Committee
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & defeated (Bray)--(3342S04.01S)
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3342S.04C)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 887-Schaefer
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor