+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 885-Walsh
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Progress and Development Committee
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 885-Walsh
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor