+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2002 in the House:
- Hearing Scheduled - REC HCS (Consent Vote) H Commerce & Economic Development Committee (HR 7 - 2:00 p.m.)
On April 11, 2002 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Commerce & Economic Development Committee
On April 9, 2002 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Commerce & Economic Development Committee - Consent
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Referred H Commerce & Economic Development Committee
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Local Government & Economic Development Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government & Economic Development Committee-Consent (2656S.03C)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Local Government & Economic Development Committee
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government & Economic Development Committee
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On January 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor