+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- H adopts CCR
- CCS H Third Read and Passed
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended
- HCS H Defeated
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Wiemann)--(5722S01.14S)
- HA 1 to HA 2 H offered & defeated (Quade)--(5722S01.20H)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- HA 2 to HA 2 H offered & adopted (Wiemann)--(5722S01.23H)
- HA 2, as amended, H adopted
- HA 2 H offered (Fitzpatrick)--(5722S01.16H)
- S refuses to concur in SB 884-Koenig, with HA 1 & HA 2, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- House conferees appointed: Wiemann, Haahr, Fitzpatrick, Carpenter, Kendrick
- Senate conferees appointed: Koenig, Eigel, Onder, Rizzo, Holsman
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR S offered & adopted (Koenig)
- CCS S Third Read and Passed
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- H distributes CCR (5722S03.01F)
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Perfected
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 884-Koenig
+ − Amendments (25)
5722S.03S
CCS S Third Read and Passed
5722S03.1SR
CCR S offered & adopted (Koenig)
5722S03.01F
Distributed
5722S01.21H
Distributed
5722H02.23H
Adopted
5722S01.20H
Defeated
5722S01.17H
Distributed
5722S01.16H
Adopted
5722S01.14H
Adopted
5722S01.13H
Distributed
5722H01.09H
Distributed
5722S01.10H
Distributed
5722S01.11H
Distributed
5722H02.22H
Distributed
5722H02.19H
Distributed
5722H02.18H
Distributed
5722H02.17H
Distributed
5722H02.16H
Distributed
5722H02.15H
Distributed
5722H02.14H
Distributed
5722H02.02H
Distributed
5722H02.10H
Distributed
5722H02.08H
Distributed
5722H02.05H
Distributed
5722H02.03H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor