+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HA 1
- Motion S to concur with HA 1 withdrawn (Hoskins)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Wood)--(5755S02.04H)
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Placed Back on Formal Calendar
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Bill placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Ways and Means
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected
- SS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 882-Hoskins
+ − Amendments (2)
5755S02.04H
Adopted
5755S.02F
SS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor