+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 871-Wallingford
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 871-Wallingford
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor