+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Emery)--(0611S02.01S)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee - (0611S.02C)
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 87-Schaaf
On December 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0611S02.01S
Withdrawn
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor