+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 10, 2014 in the House:
- Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
- Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
- H adopted motion to override Governor's veto
- Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
- H adopted motion to override Governor's veto
On September 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S adopted motion to override Governor's veto
On July 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee
- Referred to H Rules Committee
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Financial Institutions Committee
- H Second Read
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- SS S offered (Wasson)--(5808S.02F)
- SS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(5808S02.01S)
- Perfected
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 866-Wasson
+ − Amendments (2)
5808S02.01S
Adopted
5808S.02F
Adopted, as amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor