+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2008 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Hearing Conducted
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(21)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Financial Institutions Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Financial Institutions Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Financial Institutions Committee
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Financial Institutions Committee
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Loudon)--(8106S08.01S)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Small Business, Insurance & Industrial Relations Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance & Industrial Relations Committee (3277S.04C)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance & Industrial Relations Committee
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance & Industrial Relations Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 865-Rupp and Gibbons
On December 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor