+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 852-Lager, et al, with SS, SA 1 & SSA 1 for SA 1 (pending)
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered (Shoemyer)--(4338S03.14S)
- SA 1 to SS S offered (Callahan)--(4338S03.13S)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SS S offered (Lager)--(4338S.03F)
- Point of order S withdrawn
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar with point of order (pending)
- Taken up for Perfection
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 852-Lager, et al
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor