+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 16, 2008 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules Voted Do Pass - Consent
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Action Postponed
- Rules - Hearing Conducted
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee - Consent
- Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee - Consent
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(21)(f)
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Professional Registration and Licensing Committee
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent (3117S.02C)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 850-Justus
On December 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor