+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor